05/06/2010 | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. | |||
05/06/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
04/13/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 13, 2010. | |||
04/07/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/06/2010 | Reported with amendments (12-0-1) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/15/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/15/2010 | Prefiled. |