LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB505
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB505
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB505
Action History
05/19/2010
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
05/18/2010
Reported favorably (14-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations.
03/29/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
03/19/2010
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
03/15/2010
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
03/15/2010
Prefiled.