|
06/20/2010
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|