LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB536
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB536
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB536
Action History
05/17/2010
Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
05/17/2010
Discharged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
04/06/2010
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
04/05/2010
Read by title.
03/19/2010
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
03/16/2010
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.