|
06/22/2010
|
Effective date: July 1, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 475.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|