|
06/22/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 477.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Reported favorably (8-0-1) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|