|
07/06/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 979.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Gautreaux, N., Morrish, and Gautreaux, B..
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Baldone, Dove, and Gisclair.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|