04/14/2010 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | |||
04/13/2010 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | |||
04/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 13, 2010. | |||
04/07/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/06/2010 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/16/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/16/2010 | Prefiled. |