04/13/2010 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 59. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 13, 2010. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/07/2010 | Reported favorably (9-7) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
02/26/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2010. | |||
02/26/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
02/26/2010 | Prefiled. |