05/06/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/29/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/28/2010 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |||
04/13/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/16/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/16/2010 | Prefiled. |