LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB6
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB6
Action History
04/29/2010
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
04/28/2010
Reported favorably (14-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations.
03/29/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
02/05/2010
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/5/2010.
01/29/2010
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
01/29/2010
Prefiled.