|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|