06/03/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/27/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/20/2010 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). | |||
05/06/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
05/05/2010 | Reported with amendments (6-5) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/16/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
03/16/2010 | Prefiled. |