|
06/09/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 195.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|