|
06/03/2010
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|