|
06/30/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 827.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice the House reconsidered rejection of Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 59, nays 24, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 52, nays 27, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 14, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|