|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 39. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Reported with amendments (8-3) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2010.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|