|
07/08/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1023.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hebert, Riser, and Morrell.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Kleckley, and Talbot.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 29, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported with amendments (7-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|