|
05/04/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 29, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|