04/21/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |||
04/21/2010 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/15/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 21, 2010. | |||
04/14/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/18/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled. |