|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 19, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|