|
07/02/2010
|
Effective date: August 15, 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 930.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|