|
06/15/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|