HLS 10RS-1740 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2010 HOUSE BILL NO. 868 BY REPRESENTATIVE ROBIDEAUX TAX/SEVERANCE TAX: Provides relative to applications for two-year inactive well certifications AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:633(7)(c)(iv)(aa), relative to the severance tax on oil and2 natural gas; to provide relative to qualifications for inactive well status; to delete3 certain application requirements; to provide for an effective date; and to provide for4 related matters.5 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6 Section 1. R.S. 47:633(7)(c)(iv)(aa), is hereby amended and reenacted to read as7 follows: 8 ยง633. Rates of tax9 The taxes on natural resources severed from the soil or water levied by R.S.10 47:631 shall be predicated on the quantity or value of the products or resources11 severed and shall be paid at the following rates:12 * * *13 (7)(a)14 * * *15 (c)(i)16 * * *17 (iv) Production from oil and gas wells shall be exempt from severance tax18 for a period of five years when returned to service after being inactive for two or19 more years or having thirty days or less of production during the past two years. The20 HLS 10RS-1740 ORIGINAL HB NO. 868 Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. exemption shall be extended by the length of any inactivity of a well that has1 commenced production when such inactivity is caused by a force majeure.2 (aa) To qualify for inactive well status, an application for a two-year inactive3 well certification shall be made to the Department of Natural Resources, before4 commencement of production, during the period beginning July 31, 1994, and ending5 June 30, 2000, for the period beginning July 1, 2002, and ending June 30, 2006, and6 for the period beginning July 1, 2006, and ending June 30, 2010. Upon certification7 that a well is inactive, all production is exempt from severance tax for a period of8 five years from the date production begins or ninety days from the date of the9 application, whichever occurs first.10 * * *11 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2010; if vetoed by the governor12 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,13 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.14 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Robideaux HB No. 868 Abstract: Deletes the requirement that applications be filed before commencement of production. Present law requires a tax on natural resources severed from the soil or water to be predicated on the quantity or value of the products or resources severed. Further provides that production from oil and gas wells shall be exempt from severance tax for five years when returned to service after being inactive for two or more years or having 30 days or less of production during the past two years. Present law requires that in order to qualify for inactive well status, an application for a two- year inactive well certification shall be made to the Dept. of Natural Resources, before commencement of production, for the period beginning July 1, 2006, and ending June 30, 2010. Proposed law deletes the requirement that the application be filed before commencement of production. Effective July 1, 2010. (Amends R.S. 47:633(7)(c)(iv)(aa))