04/19/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 15, 2010. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |||
04/07/2010 | Reported favorably (11-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/18/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled. |