04/29/2010 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
04/26/2010 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
04/22/2010 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
04/21/2010 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
04/21/2010 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
04/21/2010 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |||
04/14/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |||
04/14/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |