|
06/15/2010
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 76, nays 19. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|