06/10/2010 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/09/2010 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/09/2010 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/08/2010 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
06/08/2010 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/07/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
05/04/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
05/04/2010 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |