|
06/18/2010
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|