06/15/2010 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/11/2010 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/10/2010 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/10/2010 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
06/10/2010 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/09/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
06/09/2010 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/04/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |||
06/04/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/03/2010 | Reported favorably (12-0). | |||
05/06/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
05/05/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |