06/16/2010 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
06/16/2010 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |||
06/16/2010 | Rules suspended | |||
06/15/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
06/10/2010 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |||
06/09/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
06/09/2010 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 2. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/04/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |||
06/04/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/03/2010 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | |||
05/07/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |