06/18/2010 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/15/2010 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/14/2010 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/11/2010 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
06/11/2010 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/11/2010 | Rules suspended | |||
06/10/2010 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |||
05/12/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |||
05/12/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |