Louisiana 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR207 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            HLS 10RS-864	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2010
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 207
BY REPRESENTATIVE HARDY
WATER/DRINKING WATER: Directs the Fluoridation Advisory Board to address
questions and concerns regarding the health, environmental, and fiscal effects of
fluoridation of drinking water and to report responses to certain legislative
committees
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1
To direct the Fluoridation Advisory Board to address questions and concerns regarding the2
health, environmental, and fiscal effects of fluoridation of drinking water and to3
report responses to such questions and concerns to the House Committee on Health4
and Welfare, the Senate Committee on Health and Welfare, the House Committee5
on Natural Resources and Environment, the Senate Committee on Environmental6
Quality, the House Appropriations Committee, and the Senate Finance Committee.7
WHEREAS, Act No. 761 of the 2008 Regular Session of the Legislature of Louisiana8
relates to water systems which provide drinking water to more than five thousand customer9
connections and which have natural fluoride levels below the optimal range as established10
by rule; and11
WHEREAS, this Act requires such water systems to fluoridate their water supplies12
to within the established optimal range, provided that the state of Louisiana funds the13
acquisition and installation of fluoridation equipment and material required to fluoridate14
such system for at least six months from the date of initial installation; and15
WHEREAS, Act No. 908 of the 1997 Regular Session of the Legislature of Louisiana16
established the Fluoridation Advisory Board within the Department of Health and Hospitals,17
office of public health, for the stated purpose of protecting the dental health of the citizens18
of this state; and19 HLS 10RS-864	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 207
Page 2 of 3
WHEREAS, the United States Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) sets1
standards for the concentration of fluoride in drinking water in accordance with the Safe2
Drinking Water Act; and3
WHEREAS, the National Academy of Sciences commissioned a study of drinking4
water fluoridation by the National Research Council which resulted in the release of a report5
in 2006 titled "Fluoride in Drinking Water: a Scientific Review of EPA's Standard"; and6
WHEREAS, this study concluded that "the EPA's Maximum Contaminant Level of7
four point zero milligrams per liter is not protective of public health", and recommended8
topics for further research; and9
WHEREAS, in the April 12, 2010, issue of Time Magazine, fluoride is named as one10
of the ten most common household toxins; and11
WHEREAS, the EPA has no authority under law to endorse or oppose fluoridation12
of drinking water, while the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) recognizes13
fluoridation of drinking water as one of the "ten great public health achievements of the14
twentieth century" and endorses and actively promotes artificial fluoridation of drinking15
water yet recommends against using fluoridated water in infant formula, suggesting that the16
science of drinking water fluoridation is yet to be settled; and17
WHEREAS, an organized group of scientists and other professional staff of the EPA18
have long supported discontinuing the practice of fluoridation until the science of this19
practice is settled; and20
WHEREAS, the Fluoride Action Network has published on its website,21
www.fluorideaction.org, a list of fifty reasons to oppose fluoridation developed by Dr. Paul22
Connett, Professor of Chemistry at St. Lawrence University; and23
WHEREAS, the signing of Act No. 761 of the 2008 Regular Session of the24
Legislature of Louisiana into law as R.S. 40:5.11 has stimulated a number of scientific,25
environmental, legal, and ethical questions; and26
WHEREAS, the Lafayette City-Parish Council passed Resolution R-024-2009 in27
April 2009 to officially oppose the fluoridation of the Lafayette Utilities System water28
supply and to request that the Acadiana delegation of the Legislature of Louisiana seek29
legislation to repeal R.S. 40:5.11.30 HLS 10RS-864	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 207
Page 3 of 3
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby1
direct the group known as Citizens Opposing Fluoridation to prepare a list of questions and2
concerns regarding the health, environmental, and fiscal effects of fluoridation.3
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that on or before September 1, 2010, Citizens4
Opposing Fluoridation shall furnish a document containing this list of questions and5
concerns to the Fluoridation Advisory Board, the House Committee on Health and Welfare,6
the Senate Committee on Health and Welfare, the House Committee on Natural Resources7
and Environment, the Senate Committee on Environmental Quality, the House8
Appropriations Committee, and the Senate Finance Committee.9
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Fluoridation Advisory Board shall prepare10
a written response to the questions and concerns submitted by Citizens Opposing11
Fluoridation.12
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that on or before December 31, 2010, the13
Fluoridation Advisory Board shall furnish such response to the House Committee on Health14
and Welfare, the Senate Committee on Health and Welfare, the House Committee on Natural15
Resources and Environment, the Senate Committee on Environmental Quality, the House16
Appropriations Committee, and the Senate Finance Committee.17
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Hardy	HCR No. 207
Directs the group known as Citizens Opposing Fluoridation to submit by Sept. 1, 2010, a list
of questions and concerns regarding the health, environmental, and fiscal effects of
fluoridation of drinking water to the Fluoridation Advisory Board and to the House
Committee on Health and Welfare, the Senate Committee on Health and Welfare, the House
Committee on Natural Resources and Environment, the Senate Committee on Environmental
Quality, the House Appropriations Committee, and the Senate Finance Committee.
Directs the Fluoridation Advisory Board to respond in writing to these questions and
concerns, and to provide such response to the House Committee on Health and Welfare, the
Senate Committee on Health and Welfare, the House Committee on Natural Resources and
Environment, the Senate Committee on Environmental Quality, the House Appropriations
Committee, and the Senate Finance Committee by Dec. 31, 2010.