06/18/2010 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/09/2010 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/09/2010 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/09/2010 | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. | |||
06/08/2010 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |||
06/08/2010 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
06/07/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
06/03/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read by title, rules suspended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |