LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR26
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR26
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR26
Action History
05/03/2010
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
04/29/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010.
04/21/2010
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
04/20/2010
Reported favorably (14-0-1).
03/30/2010
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
03/29/2010
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.