05/24/2010 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/17/2010 | Reported favorably. | |||
05/03/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/29/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010. | |||
04/21/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
04/20/2010 | Reported favorably (10-0-1). | |||
03/30/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |