|
06/17/2010
|
Notice of change of Senate conferees.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Senate Conference Committee membership changed: Dorsey vice Cheek.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Kostelka, and Cheek.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Morris, Gallot, and Geymann.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Reported favorably (18-0).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|