06/10/2010 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |||
06/09/2010 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
06/09/2010 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 59, nays 32. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/04/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |||
06/04/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/03/2010 | Reported favorably (11-0). | |||
03/31/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/30/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |