|
06/24/2010
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Mount, Cheek, and Dorsey.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Richard, Katz, and Burford.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|