06/07/2010 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/7/2010. | |||
06/07/2010 | Approved on 6/7/10. | |||
05/26/2010 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/26/10. | |||
05/25/2010 | Request study by the committee on Insurance. | |||
05/25/2010 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/25/10. | |||
05/25/2010 | Sent to the Senate. | |||
05/18/2010 | Study request list distributed to members on May 18. | |||
05/06/2010 | Received on May 6. |