06/14/2010 | Approved on 6/14/10. | |||
06/09/2010 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/9/10. | |||
06/08/2010 | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
06/08/2010 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/8/10. | |||
06/07/2010 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/14/2010. | |||
06/07/2010 | Sent to the Senate. | |||
06/01/2010 | Study request list distributed to members on June 2. | |||
05/20/2010 | Received on May 29. |