05/26/2010 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/25/2010 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 63, nays 24. The resolution was adopted. | |||
05/25/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
05/18/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |||
05/18/2010 | Notice given. | |||
05/18/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/13/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/12/2010 | Reported with amendments (9-3). | |||
04/06/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/05/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |