06/15/2010 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/14/2010 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | |||
06/14/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
06/08/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010. | |||
06/08/2010 | Notice given. | |||
06/02/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/27/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/20/2010 | Reported favorably (11-0). | |||
05/17/2010 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |