|
06/01/2010
|
Effective date 8/15/10.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 63.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 20, 2010.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|