|
07/09/2010
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2010
|
Becomes Act No. 1050
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|