Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
05/06/2010
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
05/05/2010
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
05/04/2010
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
05/03/2010
Reported favorably.
03/29/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
03/05/2010
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.