05/24/2010 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
04/28/2010 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/28/2010 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
04/26/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |||
03/17/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |