|
06/09/2010
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|