05/24/2010 | Reconsidered. Read by title as amended; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/19/2010 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |||
05/19/2010 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 21 nays. | |||
05/19/2010 | Called from the calendar. | |||
05/12/2010 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/11/2010 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 5/12. | |||
05/11/2010 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
04/28/2010 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/29/2010 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
03/18/2010 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |