Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
04/21/2010
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
04/20/2010
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
04/19/2010
Reported favorably.
03/29/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources.
03/18/2010
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources.